Bell, Alexandra Elizabeth (CPSO#: 104475)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2017 to 07 Apr 2017
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2017