Bell, Brian David (CPSO#: 70755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
P.O. Box 9056
835 King St West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DAVID BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 1996 to 25 Aug 1996
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 1997 to 19 Oct 1997
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998