Bell, David Arthur (CPSO#: 19200)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record should send a written request to: 1592 Gloucester Road London, ON N6G 2S6
Date Received: 24 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013