Bell, Dayna Lindsay (CPSO#: 87873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAYNA LINDSAY BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2013 to 10 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2012