Bell, James Kenneth (CPSO#: 10610)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1937

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1938
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994