Bell, Marilynne Louise (CPSO#: 32380)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Mar 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Oct 1992