Bell, Mary Jane (CPSO#: 50133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite MI - 401
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4580
Fax: (416) 480-4233
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Jane Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bell ( CPSO# 50133 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M1 - 401
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY JANE BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987