Bell, Michael Samuel Glen (CPSO#: 22838)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 1B 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242 Fax: (613) 738-0562 Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 08 Sep 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2010