Bell, Robert Clark (CPSO#: 53129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
5-14
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82565
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARK BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1988