Bell, Stuart David (CPSO#: 65990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4134
Fax: (416) 284-1780
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huntsville District Memorial Hosp.
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Canada
Phone: 705 789 0022 Ext. 2326
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2480
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health
Ajax and Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905 683 2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Ellesmere X-Ray Associates
Suite 101
3070 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-1697
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stuart Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bell ( CPSO# 65990 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
Scarborough Centenary Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART DAVID BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1995