Bellaire, Joan Patricia (CPSO#: 66598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smithville Med. Centre FHT
230 Canboro Street
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Fax: (905) 957-2475
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bellaire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bellaire ( CPSO# 66598 )

Business Address:
Smithville Medical Centre FHT
230 Canboro Street
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Phone Number: (905) 957-3870

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN PATRICIA BELLAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLAIRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995