Bellamy, Nicholas (CPSO#: 30399)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016