Bellapart Rubio, Judith (CPSO#: 78553)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Barcelona, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 May 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2004