Belletrutti, Mark John (CPSO#: 81829)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2004 to 24 Sep 2004
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 12 May 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008