Belley-Cote, Emilie-Prudence (CPSO#: 97709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St. East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 527 4322 Ext. 40306
Fax: 905 577 8017
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILIE-PRUDENCE BELLEY-COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLEY-COTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 9 - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2012