Bellingham, Geoff Alexander (CPSO#: 79196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care London
Department of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street Room B6 665
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64219
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geoffrey A. Bellingham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bellingham ( CPSO# 79196 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care London
Department of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
B6 665 - 268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFF ALEXANDER BELLINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009