Bellini, Andrew Bruno (CPSO#: 65301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Campus
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bellini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bellini ( CPSO# 65301 )

Business Address:
11 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-6362

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre - Civic Campus
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 30 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW BRUNO BELLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993