Bellis, Magdaleni (CPSO#: 88408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University College, Cork, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Forensic Services & Coroners Office
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647) 329-1913
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDALENI BELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2014