Bellisario, Alessandro (CPSO#: 66221)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Libera Universita degli Studi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 13 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997