Belliveau, Michel James-Rheal (CPSO#: 88414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Professional Centre
Suite 414
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 737-1000
Fax: (613) 731-9999
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Riverside Eye Care Centre
The Ottawa Hospital
3rd Floor Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: 613-738-8537
Fax: 613-738-8394
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

CHEO
C8 Eye Clinic
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: 613-738-4237
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Site
Dept of Ophthalmology
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 613-544-3400 Ext. 2169
Fax: 613-544-8330
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Eye Institute
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8575
Fax: (613) 739-6291
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Belliveau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Belliveau ( CPSO# 88414 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus - Eye Care Centre
3rd Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8537

Business Address:
Suite 414
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 737-1000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8575

Business Address:
C8 Eye Clinic
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
2116 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 6M7
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL JAMES-RHEAL BELLIVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLIVEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013