Belo, Susan Eva (CPSO#: 53889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Belo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Belo ( CPSO# 53889 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook And Women's College
M3-200 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN EVA BELO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1988