Belostotsky, Vladimir (CPSO#: 96600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Paediatric Nephrology Unit, Ward 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75635
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Belostotsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Belostotsky ( CPSO# 96600 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Paediatric Nephrology Unit
Ward 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vladimir Belostotsky may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Division of Nephrology, McMaster University, in which
                        Dr. Belostotsky  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The   certificate   of   registration   automatically  expires  when  Dr.
                  Belostotsky no longer holds the apointment, referred to in clause 1.