Ben Ibrahim, Mohamed Ali (CPSO#: 76832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 946-0597
Fax: (519) 971-8639
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ALI BEN IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 08 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2002 to 08 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2003 to 08 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2004 to 08 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2006