Ben Issa, Entisar Milad (CPSO#: 82223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Bristol Road East
unit # 4
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3K8
Phone: 905-5010035
Fax: 905-5010039
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Queensway West
Unit # 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 905-8979228
Fax: 905-8979229
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ben Issa, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ben Issa ( CPSO# 82223 )

Business Address:
4 - 60 Bristol Road East
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3K8
Phone Number: (905) 501-0035

Business Address:
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENTISAR MILAD BEN ISSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN ISSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 27 Apr 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2011