Ben-Arie, Oved (CPSO#: 60691)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 13-1 High Meadow Place North York ON M9L 0A3 Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 06 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2017