Ben-Omran, Tawfeg I (CPSO#: 77037)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2002 to 30 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006