Benavente, Oscar Ramon (CPSO#: 63338)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2009