Benchetrit, Arie (CPSO#: 53650)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2002