Benchitrit, Moise (CPSO#: 53506)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Paris, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Mar 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Feb 2001
Summary:

On February 8, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Benchitrit guilty of professional 
misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice and incompetence in his care of 
several patients, particularly in respect of his prescription of central nervous system stimulants 
and his assessment of attention deficit hyperactive disorder. 
 
On February 20, 2001, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1. recorded reprimand; 
 
2. suspension of Dr. Benchitrit s certificate of registration effective March 26, 2001 until he has 
successfully completed, with a practice supervisor, a program that is designed or approved by the 
College that establishes that he has the appropriate knowledge, skill and judgement in 
(a) history taking and differential diagnosis; 
(b) appropriate use of DSM IV diagnostic criteria and axis diagnosis; 
(c) monitoring patient prescription drug use in accordance with current standards; 
(d) appropriate record keeping with respect to patient encounters and medications prescribed; and 
(e) psychopharmacology. 
 
3. Dr. Benchitrit shall be permitted to retain a restricted form of certificate of registration, which 
will limit his practice to the examination of patients under direct supervision of a preceptor in an 
academic setting for as long as he is taking the program specified in this Order. 
 
4. The preceptor shall be the practice supervisor for the purpose of the program specified in this 
Order and the program shall involve assessment, remediation, and reassessment in the areas of 
concern identified under paragraph 2.  The College shall require as a measure of successful 
completion of the program the delivery by the preceptor of a written report satisfactory to the 
Registrar regarding the areas identified in paragraph 2. 
 
5. Upon Dr. Benchitrit s return to practice the Registrar shall be directed to impose the following 
terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Benchitrit s certificate of registration: 
(a) Dr. Benchitrit will consent to a review of his clinical practice and pharmacy records by an 
assessor satisfactory to the Registrar.  The assessor will report the findings to the Registrar at six 
months after Dr. Benchitrit returning to practice and thereafter six month intervals for a total of 
two years and then annually for a period of three years.  All costs being the responsibility of Dr. 
Benchitrit.  If the reports are not satisfactory to the Registrar, the Registrar will take such action 
as deemed appropriate.          
(b) Dr. Benchitrit will implement in his practice the treatment guidelines established by the 
American Academy of Child Psychiatry Practice Parameters on ADHD (1996) or equivalent 
guidelines as they may be subsequently published. 
(c) Dr. Benchitrit will provide to the Registrar on an annual basis proof of participation in 
ongoing education in accordance with the Guidelines of the Royal College of Physicians and 
Surgeons of Canada in effect from time to time. 
 
6. The Registrar shall be directed to further suspend indefinitely the certificate of registration of 
Dr. Benchitrit if he breaches the terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration 
as set out in paragraph 5 (a) to (c) of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 30 Nov 2002
Hearing Date(s): Jun 12, 2000