Bencze, Istvan Tamas (CPSO#: 50823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 729-8262
Fax: (613) 729-7870
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven T. Bencze Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bencze ( CPSO# 50823 )

Business Address:
201 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 255-2871

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISTVAN TAMAS BENCZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENCZE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1984