Bendell, James John (CPSO#: 66876)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004