Bender, Ashley David (CPSO#: 73844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3250 Bloor Street West
Suite 600, East Tower
Toronto ON  M8X 2X9
Phone: (647) 775-1530
Fax: (647) 930-9471
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Work, Stress and Health, CAMH
455 Spadina Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 77364
Fax: 416-971-7172
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto South Detention Centre
160 Horner Ave
Toronto ON  M8Z 0C2
Canada
Phone: 416-354-4030
Fax: 416-354-4094
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

East Detention Centre
50 Civic Road
Scarborough ON  M1L 2K9
Canada
Phone: (416) 750-3513 Ext. 217
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.D. Bender Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bender ( CPSO# 73844 )

Business Address:
50 Civic Road
Scarborough ON  M1L 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 750-3513

Business Address:
200 - 455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
3250 Bloor Street West
Suite 600
Toronto ON  M8X 2X9
Phone Number: (647) 775-1530

Business Address:
150 Horner Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 4X8
Phone Number: (416) 354-4030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY DAVID BENDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004