Benes, Catherine (CPSO#: 65676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite de Lyon I, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Suite 508-509
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 464-5832
Fax: (416) 538-1338
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 43000
Fax: 416-242-1025
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CMHA
26 James Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 1T5
Canada
Phone: (705)746-4264
Fax: (705)746-1537
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

Centre Francophone de Toronto
555 Richmond St. West
Toronto ON  M5V 3B1
Canada
Phone: 416-922-2672
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unison Health and Community Service
1651 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3W2
Canada
Phone: 416-653-5400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Benes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Benes ( CPSO# 65676 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
26 James Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 1T5
Phone Number: (705) 746-4264

Business Address:
Suites 508 and 509
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 464-5832

Business Address:
555 Richmond Street West
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5V 3B1
Phone Number: (416) 922-2672

Business Address:
1651 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3W2
Phone Number: (416) 653-5400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE BENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996