Benfayed, Hamdi Helal (CPSO#: 55106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 501
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 426-8100
Fax: (905) 426-2036
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ajax Pickering Health Centre
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1478
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hamdi Benfayed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Benfayed ( CPSO# 55106 )

Business Address:
501 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-8100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAMDI HELAL BENFAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENFAYED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1995
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Nov 1996
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998