Benger, Ann Margaret (CPSO#: 32982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 575-9827
Fax: (905) 575-6340
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Benger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Benger ( CPSO# 32982 )

Business Address:
Juranvinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 575-9827

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN MARGARET BENGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1981