Bengizi, Adel Abdalla Ali (CPSO#: 71626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44890
Fax: (905) 527-4233
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

32-1960 appleby line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: 905-335-1888
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

726 Uppper James st
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 905-575-5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Bengizi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bengizi ( CPSO# 71626 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L7L 0B7

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEL ABDALLA ALI BENGIZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENGIZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 19 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Jul 2007