Beninger, Francis Gregory (CPSO#: 62639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1813 Wellness Lane
Trinity FL  33609
United States
Phone: 727-376-3999
Fax: 727-376-4155
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francis Beninger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Francis Beninger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCIS GREGORY BENINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1991