Benisty, Jacques (CPSO#: 64894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUES BENISTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENISTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1992