Benjamin, Derek Scott (CPSO#: 71250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-9843
Fax: (705) 728-8476
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

RVH Satellite Dialysis Unit
66 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1K4
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 24600
Fax: (705) 728-8396
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

200 fletcher cres
Alliston ON  L9R 1M1
Canada
Phone: 17054356281
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Benjamin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Benjamin ( CPSO# 71250 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-9843

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK SCOTT BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002