Benjamin, Marcia Dawn (CPSO#: 71280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: Warnock, Marcia Dawn (used until: 06 Apr 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quarry Ridge Medical Centre
Suite 203
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-9843
Fax: (705) 728-8476
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIA DAWN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004