Benjamin, Sophiya (CPSO#: 100014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Christian Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 479-4300 Ext. 7998
Fax: (519) 894-8308
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital, KW site
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 479-4300 Ext. 7998
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D & S Benjamin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Benjamin ( CPSO# 100015)
Dr. S. Benjamin ( CPSO# 100014)

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 569-9141

Business Address:
80 Waterloo Avenue
Guelph ON  N1H 0A1

Business Address:
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2

Business Address:
10 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 24 May 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sophiya  Benjamin  may  practise  medicine independently in Psychiatry and
            Geriatric Psychiatry.