Benko, Randy Robin (CPSO#: 77533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Department of Anaesthesia
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33853
Fax: (905) 521-6066
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randy Benko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Benko ( CPSO# 77533 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDY ROBIN BENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007