Benkoczi, Carmen Lucia (CPSO#: 81775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
143 Churchill Crescent
Kingston ON  K7L 4N3
Phone: (613) 453-3580
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARMEN LUCIA BENKOCZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENKOCZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2004