Benmoftah, Osama Sadegh Abouzreba (CPSO#: 80627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
JACOBS PAIN CENTER
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. Benmoftah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Benmoftah ( CPSO# 80627 )

Business Address:
1200 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 515-2120

Business Address:
1 Wexford Road
Suite 8
Brampton ON  L6Z 2W1
Phone Number: (905) 790-0045

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSAMA SADEGH ABOUZREBA BENMOFTAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENMOFTAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 01 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 02 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009