Benn, Ruth Lawson (CPSO#: 60889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: McConkey, Ruth Lawson (used until: 19 Aug 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Sarnia Road
London ON  N6G 5A3
Phone: (519) 432-5508
Fax: (519) 433-3394
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH LAWSON BENN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1991 to 30 Apr 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990