Benne, Tobias (CPSO#: 72137)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 May 1998 to 28 May 1998
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 28 May 1998 to 25 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Apr 2007