Bennett, Diana Ruth (CPSO#: 63368)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1991
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Feb 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017