Bennett, John Douglas (CPSO#: 54732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
279 Wharncliffe Road
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone: (519) 661-0275
Fax: (519) 661-0616
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

VenaCare
Suite 230
279 Wharncliffe Rd. North
London ON  N6H 2C2
Canada
Phone: (519) 660-6418
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bennett ( CPSO# 54732 )

Business Address:
111 - 279 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 661-0275

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)