Bennett, Kelly Angela (CPSO#: 67265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B 1100 Medical Center North
Department of OB/GYN
Maternal -Fetal -Medicine
Vanderbilt University
Nashville TN  37232
United States
Phone: (615) 343-6275
Fax: (615) 343-8881

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY ANGELA BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007