Bennett, Margaret Hope (CPSO#: 65509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3080 Yonge St
Suite 5080
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: (416) 782-4447
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret H. Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2006

Dr. M. Bennett ( CPSO# 65509 )

Business Address:
Suite 5080
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (416) 782-4447

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MARGARET HOPE BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993